Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 2760 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16166 Week
» 69182 Month
» 188709 Year
» 3215562 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13329 |
14/12/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3329 |
06/01/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08259 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (08/9) |
08992 |
04/1985 |
08-ODC to 08-OHV |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/12/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
14/12/1956 |
Power Unit IH3556 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13329 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
06/01/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3329 |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08259 |
|
|
05/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
05/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SW) |
|
|
01/12/1980 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08992 |
|
|
01/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08992 |
|
|
10/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Swansea Maliphant |
|
|