Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 931 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18734 Week
» 71750 Month
» 191277 Year
» 3218130 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13326 |
28/11/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3326 |
27/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08256 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
28/11/1956 |
Power Unit IH3516 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13326 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
27/05/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3326 |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08256 |
|
|
19/02/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08256 from Colchester (CR) |
|
|
05/01/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|