Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 385 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18188 Week
» 71204 Month
» 190731 Year
» 3217584 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13320 |
16/10/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3320 |
20/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08250 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/10/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
16/10/1956 |
Power Unit IH3534 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/10/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13320 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
20/02/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3320 |
|
|
18/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
13/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08250 |
|
|
23/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NR) |
|
|
30/11/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08250 from Norwich Thorpe (NC) |
|
|
07/08/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|