Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 317 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18120 Week
» 71136 Month
» 190663 Year
» 3217516 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
3317 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
Great Western Railway (1912) |
3284 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
Great Western Railway (90xx) |
9084 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Duke |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
113 |
Works Number |
1687 |
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 03/05/1951 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STB |
Stourbridge Junction |
m/e |
31/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
MCH |
Machynlleth |
4w/e |
31/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
OSW |
|
4w/e |
28/01/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1906 |
Diagram BR4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
09/1911 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
09/1911 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
03/1916 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/10/1948 |
Swindon Stock Shed (Newburn Wagon Repair) |
On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. |
SLS/194812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3317, name: Jersey Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1687 Diagram S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
01/1904 |
Naming |
Renamed 'Isle of Jersey' |
|
|
12/1906 |
Modification |
Diagram BR4 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1911 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1912 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3284 |
|
|
03/1916 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberystwyth (ABH) |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9084 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stourbridge Junction (STB) |
|
|
31/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (STB) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (MCH) |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
03/05/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9084 |
|
|