Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 4060 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22971 Week
» 87925 Month
» 290589 Year
» 3317442 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13317 |
27/10/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3317 |
29/12/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08247 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/10/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
27/10/1956 |
Power Unit IH3532 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13317 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
29/12/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3317 |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
19/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
22/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
27/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08247 |
|
|
08/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (DT) |
|
|
15/03/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08247 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|