Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1574 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7358 Week
» 28747 Month
» 148274 Year
» 3175127 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13308 |
20/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3308 |
22/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08238 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
20/05/1956 |
Power Unit IH3501 |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13308 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
22/10/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3308 |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
22/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
21/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08238 |
|
|
05/06/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
13/11/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
18/03/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08238 from Gloucester Horton Road (GL) |
|
|