Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 2749 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16155 Week
» 69171 Month
» 188698 Year
» 3215551 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13307 |
16/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3307 |
21/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08237 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
16/05/1956 |
Power Unit IH3499 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13307 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3307 |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08237 |
|
|
07/10/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08237 from Bounds Green (BN) |
|
|
10/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|