Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 893 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14299 Week
» 67315 Month
» 186842 Year
» 3213695 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13306 |
11/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3306 |
09/06/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08236 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
11/05/1956 |
Power Unit IH3497 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13306 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
09/06/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3306 |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08236 |
|
|
14/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
07/09/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08236 from Willesden (WN) |
|
|
09/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|