Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1412 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14818 Week
» 67834 Month
» 187361 Year
» 3214214 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13295 |
14/01/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3295 |
19/12/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08225 |
01/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/01/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/01/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13295 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
19/12/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3295 |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08225 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DN) |
|
|
06/10/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08225 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
03/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|