Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1940 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19743 Week
» 72759 Month
» 192286 Year
» 3219139 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13290 |
14/12/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3290 |
22/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08220 |
08/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
14/12/1956 to Nottingham (16A) |
Withdrawn |
30/03/1986 off Crewe Diesel (CD) |
Time in Service |
29 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
24/10/1990 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 10/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/12/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13290 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3290 |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
10/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
08/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08220 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08220 from Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
24/10/1990 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|