Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2033 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15439 Week
» 68455 Month
» 187982 Year
» 3214835 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13289 |
10/12/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3289 |
03/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08219 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/12/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/12/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13289 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3289 |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08219 |
|
|
20/03/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08219 from Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
08/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|