Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3320 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16726 Week
» 69742 Month
» 189269 Year
» 3216122 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13287 |
30/11/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3287 |
02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08217 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/11/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13287 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
02/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3287 |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08217 |
|
|
16/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
25/04/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08217 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
14/05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|