Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1845 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19648 Week
» 72664 Month
» 192191 Year
» 3219044 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13283 |
16/11/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3283 |
11/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08213 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/11/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13283 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
06/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3283 |
|
|
11/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
03/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
05/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
08/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08213 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (AN) |
|
|
02/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08213 from Allerton (AN) |
|
|
08/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|