Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2281 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15687 Week
» 68703 Month
» 188230 Year
» 3215083 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13279 |
02/11/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3279 |
28/02/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08209 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 04/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/11/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13279 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
28/02/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3279 |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08209 |
|
|
27/02/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08209 from Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
08/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|