Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1515 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19318 Week
» 72334 Month
» 191861 Year
» 3218714 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13277 |
26/10/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3277 |
03/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08207 |
15/12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/10/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/10/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13277 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
03/02/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3277 |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
26/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
15/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08207 |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (FH) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
28/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08207 from Cambridge (CA) |
|
|
21/05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|