Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 525 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18328 Week
» 71344 Month
» 190871 Year
» 3217724 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13273 |
11/10/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3273 |
03/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08203 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (08/9) |
08991 |
04/1985 |
08-ODV to 08-OHV |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/10/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13273 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
03/06/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3273 |
|
|
30/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
03/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08203 |
|
|
04/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08991 |
|
|
01/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08991 |
|
|
09/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Swansea Maliphant |
|
|