Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1637 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7421 Week
» 28810 Month
» 148337 Year
» 3175190 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13265 |
23/08/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3265 |
06/11/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08195 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/08/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13265 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
06/11/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3265 |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08195 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
25/09/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08195 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|