Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1746 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7530 Week
» 28919 Month
» 148446 Year
» 3175299 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13261 |
05/07/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3261 |
20/09/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/07/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/07/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13261 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
20/09/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3261 |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3261 from Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|