Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 1737 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15780 Week
» 80734 Month
» 283398 Year
» 3310251 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13256 |
08/06/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3256 |
10/08/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08187 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/06/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/06/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13256 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
10/08/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3256 |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08187 |
|
|
24/07/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08187 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
30/09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|