Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1090 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24721 Week
» 89675 Month
» 292339 Year
» 3319192 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13254 |
01/06/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3254 |
29/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08186 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/06/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/06/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13254 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
29/09/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3254 |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08186 |
|
|
17/03/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08186 from Staveley (Barrow Hill) (BH) |
|
|
30/09/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|