Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 8 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17811 Week
» 70827 Month
» 190354 Year
» 3217207 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13251 |
25/05/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3251 |
11/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08183 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/05/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/05/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13251 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
11/10/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3251 |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08183 |
|
|
04/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
31/03/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08183 from Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
10/11/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|