Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1515 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19318 Week
» 72334 Month
» 191861 Year
» 3218714 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13245 |
14/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3245 |
20/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08177 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13245 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
20/05/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3245 |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08177 |
|
|
22/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
30/10/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08177 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
08/1996 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|