Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1763 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15169 Week
» 68185 Month
» 187712 Year
» 3214565 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13235 |
02/02/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3235 |
29/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08167 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/02/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
02/02/1956 |
Power Unit IH3462 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/02/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13235 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
29/01/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3235 |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
19/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
22/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08167 |
|
|
15/09/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08167 from Darlington (DN) |
|
|
07/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|