Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 161 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17964 Week
» 70980 Month
» 190507 Year
» 3217360 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13230 |
29/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3230 |
17/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08162 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
29/12/1955 |
Power Unit IH3457 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13230 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3230 |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08162 |
|
|
20/07/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08162 from Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
01/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|