Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3756 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17162 Week
» 70178 Month
» 189705 Year
» 3216558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13227 |
13/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3227 |
31/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08159 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
13/12/1955 |
Power Unit IH3137 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13227 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) |
|
|
01/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
31/05/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3227 |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08159 |
|
|
24/11/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08159 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|