Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1476 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14882 Week
» 67898 Month
» 187425 Year
» 3214278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13221 |
22/04/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3221 |
08/11/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08153 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/04/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
22/04/1955 |
Power Unit IH3415 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/04/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13221 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
08/11/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3221 |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
05/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
19/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
14/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
29/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
01/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
21/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08153 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
19/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08153 from Chester West (CH) |
|
|
12/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|