Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 293 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18096 Week
» 71112 Month
» 190639 Year
» 3217492 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13217 |
02/04/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3217 |
07/09/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08149 |
23/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/04/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
02/04/1955 |
Power Unit IH3401 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/04/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13217 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
09/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3217 |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
29/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
23/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08149 |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (DY) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/04/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08149 from Darlington (DN) |
|
|
18/02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|