Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1532 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14938 Week
» 67954 Month
» 187481 Year
» 3214334 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13210 |
16/02/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3210 |
30/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08142 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/02/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/02/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13210 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
11/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3210 |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08142 |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (DY) |
|
|
13/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08142 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
03/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|