Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 2392 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15798 Week
» 68814 Month
» 188341 Year
» 3215194 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13205 |
23/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3205 |
29/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08137 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13205 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
29/02/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3205 |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08137 |
|
|
28/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08137 from Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
14/09/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|