Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 325 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18128 Week
» 71144 Month
» 190671 Year
» 3217524 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13203 |
21/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3203 |
31/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08135 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13203 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
31/12/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3203 |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08135 |
|
|
12/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
12/02/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08135 from Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
03/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|