Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1607 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25238 Week
» 90192 Month
» 292856 Year
» 3319709 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13202 |
16/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3202 |
15/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08134 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13202 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
15/07/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3202 |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
21/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
13/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
30/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08134 |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (SY) |
|
|
20/08/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08134 from Saltley (SY) |
|
|
12/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|