Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2271 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15677 Week
» 68693 Month
» 188220 Year
» 3215073 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13200 |
13/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3200 |
31/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08132 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13200 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
31/12/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3200 |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08132 |
|
|
03/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KM) |
|
|
30/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
29/01/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08132 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
07/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|