Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2306 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20109 Week
» 73125 Month
» 192652 Year
» 3219505 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
116 |
m/e |
10/1910 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
320 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Great Western Railway (1946) |
211 |
on |
04/05/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5390 |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 03/05/1955 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys |
Total Mileage |
753,715 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/04/1948 |
Caerphilly Works |
On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 116 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5390 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 320 |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cae Harris (Dowlais) (CH) |
|
|
04/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 211 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
03/05/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 211 |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|