Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2762 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16168 Week
» 69184 Month
» 188711 Year
» 3215564 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13196 |
02/12/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3196 |
18/12/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08128 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/12/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13196 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
18/12/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3196 |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
23/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
29/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08128 |
|
|
06/08/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08128 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
18/02/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|