Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 753 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14159 Week
» 67175 Month
» 186702 Year
» 3213555 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3195 |
17/12/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86026 |
14/12/1973 |
TOPS (86/3) |
86326 |
20/03/1980 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86426 |
14/12/1984 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
17/12/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/2004 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
03/1980 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
17/12/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
03/1980 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3195 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3487 |
|
|
14/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86026 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
20/03/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86326 |
|
|
14/12/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86426 |
|
|
06/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86426 |
|
|
01/11/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|