Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 693 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14099 Week
» 67115 Month
» 186642 Year
» 3213495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13194 |
24/11/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3194 |
09/10/1959 |
At Derby Wprks |
TOPS (Tops) |
08126 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/11/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13194 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
09/10/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3194 |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CH) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08126 |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
02/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08126 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
12/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|