Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2790 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16196 Week
» 69212 Month
» 188739 Year
» 3215592 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13190 |
15/11/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3190 |
28/02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08123 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1970 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/11/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1970 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
10/10/1970 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13190 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tondu (86F) |
|
|
28/02/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3190 |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
03/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08123 |
|
|
20/03/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08123 from Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
30/06/1985 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|