Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1138 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18941 Week
» 71957 Month
» 191484 Year
» 3218337 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3187 |
17/10/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86034 |
03/1974 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86434 |
13/12/1985 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86634 |
11/04/1990 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
17/10/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/2002 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
17/10/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3187 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3479 |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86034 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
13/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86434 |
|
|
11/04/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86634 |
|
|
05/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86634 |
|
|
01/03/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|