Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1427 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14833 Week
» 67849 Month
» 187376 Year
» 3214229 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13187 |
04/11/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3187 |
23/06/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08120 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/11/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13187 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
23/06/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3187 |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
30/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08120 |
|
|
16/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DN) |
|
|
25/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08120 from Darlington (DN) |
|
|
08/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|