Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17929 Week
» 70945 Month
» 190472 Year
» 3217325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3185 |
01/10/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86005 |
06/06/1973 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86405 |
24/03/1986 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86605 |
01/10/1990 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
01/10/1965 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
03/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
01/10/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3185 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3477 |
|
|
06/06/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86005 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
24/03/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86405 |
|
|
01/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86605 |
|
|