Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1642 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15048 Week
» 68064 Month
» 187591 Year
» 3214444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13184 |
27/10/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3184 |
27/10/1961 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08117 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/10/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13184 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
27/10/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3184 |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08117 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/01/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08117 from Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|