Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1044 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14450 Week
» 67466 Month
» 186993 Year
» 3213846 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13183 |
24/10/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3183 |
27/08/1959 |
At Swindon Works |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/10/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13183 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
27/08/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3183 |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3183 from Swindon (82C) |
|
|
12/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Merthyr Vale Colliery |
|
|