Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 524 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18327 Week
» 71343 Month
» 190870 Year
» 3217723 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13181 |
18/10/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3181 |
08/02/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08115 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13181 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3181 |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
05/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08115 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
08/07/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08115 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
14/12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|