Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2059 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19862 Week
» 72878 Month
» 192405 Year
» 3219258 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
114 |
m/e |
10/1910 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
318 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Great Western Railway (1946) |
209 |
on |
09/08/1946 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5388 |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 27/08/1952 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
Total Mileage |
704,687 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1910 |
CDF |
|
Cardiff Canton |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/08/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 114 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5388 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 318 |
|
|
09/08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 209 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
27/08/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 209 |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|