Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 639 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19550 Week
» 84504 Month
» 287168 Year
» 3314021 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3178 |
21/08/1965 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86244 |
31/03/1974 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
21/08/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/2002 |
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
21/08/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/07/1973 |
|
Crewe Station |
Noted on a southbound express |
1V82 |
Lindsay Walters, Facebook |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3178 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3470 |
|
|
31/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86244 |
|
|
10/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86244 |
|
|
09/11/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Easco: at Immingham Railfreight Terminal |
|
|