Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17930 Week
» 70946 Month
» 190473 Year
» 3217326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3176 |
21/08/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86007 |
12/07/1973 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86407 |
15/05/1987 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86607 |
07/08/1989 |
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
21/08/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3176 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3468 |
|
|
12/07/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86007 |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Glasgow Shields Road (GS) |
|
|
06/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
15/05/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86407 |
|
|
07/08/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86607 |
|
|