Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1362 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14768 Week
» 67784 Month
» 187311 Year
» 3214164 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13175 |
29/09/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3175 |
28/02/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08109 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/09/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13175 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
28/02/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3175 |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
18/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08109 |
|
|
22/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
31/12/1980 |
To Store |
|
|
|
05/04/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08109 from Darlington (DN) |
|
|
10/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|