Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 844 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14250 Week
» 67266 Month
» 186793 Year
» 3213646 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13174 |
23/09/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3174 |
03/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08108 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/09/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13174 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3174 |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
19/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
18/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08108 |
|
|
16/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
25/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CA) |
|
|
08/07/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08108 from Cambridge (CA) |
|
|