Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 160 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 23791 Week
» 88745 Month
» 291409 Year
» 3318262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3173 |
21/08/1965 |
TOPS (86/2) |
86204 |
28/06/1973 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
21/08/1965 |
|
Unknown - please contact administrator! |
w/e |
15/05/1971 |
ACL |
London Midland - Western Lines |
w/e |
27/11/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/1998 |
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
21/08/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3173 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3465 |
|
|
15/05/1971 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
27/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Midland - Western Lines (ACL) |
|
|
28/06/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86204 |
|
|
08/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86204 |
|
|
30/06/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Easco: at Immingham Railfreight Terminal |
|
|