Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 417 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18220 Week
» 71236 Month
» 190763 Year
» 3217616 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13172 |
07/09/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3172 |
12/09/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/09/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13172 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (24K) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3172 |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
07/05/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3172 from Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
07/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|